+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 282
- Effective Date
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2021: House Vote #312 Local Calendar
- Yeas: 155
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 6
March 18, 2021: Senate Vote #228 PASSAGE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 5