+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 154
- Effective Date
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #407 Supplemental Local Calendar
- Yeas: 162
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 10
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #426 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
March 18, 2021: Senate Vote #227 LOCAL CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor