+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 350
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor