+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor