+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #666 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor