+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 281
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor