+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper