+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 398
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor