+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper