+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 15, 2022: Senate Vote #641 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor