+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 76
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor