+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor