+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 559
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Notice to Reconsider
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor