+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
February 7, 2022: Senate Vote #474 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4