+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act 249
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #373 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
March 29, 2021: House Vote #340 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 157
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 10
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #127 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON THE RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #128 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5