+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #156 MOTION TO ENGROSS: SB 74, SB 93, SB 141, SB 178, SB 202, SB 232, SB 199, SB 253
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #190 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 53
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor