+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Lost
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #192 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor