+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper