+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 210
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor