+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #155 MOTION TO ENGROSS: SB 213, SB 241, SR 100, SB 62, SB 69, SB 71, SB 72
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #168 MOTION TO REMOVE FROM THE TABLE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #169 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor