+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 268
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2021: House Vote #298 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 159
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 8
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #178 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5