+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
- Senate Taken from Table
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Engrossed
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
March 8, 2021: Senate Vote #156 MOTION TO ENGROSS: SB 74, SB 93, SB 141, SB 178, SB 202, SB 232, SB 199, SB 253
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor