+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper