+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 229
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (6)
Loudermilk, Barry 14th
Type:
Primary Sponsor