+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Vote
February 10, 2022: Senate Vote #493 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1