+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor