+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 723
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
- House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Tabled
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (6)
April 4, 2022: House Vote #865 Agree to Senate Am as Am
- Yeas: 165
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 9
April 4, 2022: Senate Vote #868 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #370 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
March 29, 2021: House Vote #323 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 159
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #127 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON THE RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #135 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor