+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #127 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON THE RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #143 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 7