+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 129
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper