+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 74
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper