+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 253
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #354 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 155
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
March 31, 2021: Senate Vote #398 AGREE TO HOUSE SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 8
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #106 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #111 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 52
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor