+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 136
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2021: House Vote #411 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 156
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 8
February 4, 2021: Senate Vote #21 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7