+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper