+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 35
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted As Amended
- House Third Readers
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper