+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 227
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper