+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 184
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper