+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 215
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: House Vote #266 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 162
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 12
March 1, 2021: Senate Vote #98 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 51
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor