+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 31
- Effective Date
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2021: House Vote #268 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 161
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 12
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #106 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2021: Senate Vote #124 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor