+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper