+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper