+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor