+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 187
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted
- House Third Readers
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper