+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Third Reading Lost
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Engrossed
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (3)
March 18, 2021: House Vote #272 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 139
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 18
February 24, 2021: Senate Vote #66 MOTION TO ENGROSS: HB 265, SB 89, SB 148
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2021: Senate Vote #72 PASSAGE BY SUBSTITUTE
- Yeas: 54
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor