+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Act 212
- Effective Date
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Readers
- House Passed/Adopted
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled
- Senate Taken from Table
- Senate Third Read
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Votes (4)
March 22, 2021: House Vote #278 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 10
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #127 MOTION TO TABLE ALL BILLS ON THE RULES CALENDAR
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #146 ADOPTION OF AMENDMENT #1 BY THE SENATOR FROM THE 53RD
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2021: Senate Vote #147 PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor