+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Lost
- House Third Readers
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
- House Second Readers
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper