+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Withdrawn, Recommitted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper