+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (16)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 24
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- Senate Third Read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper