+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 139
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Postponed
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended
- Senate Third Read
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper