+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective Date
- Act 2
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
- Senate Sent to Governor
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted As Amended
- House Third Readers
- House Committee Favorably Reported As Amended
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House First Readers
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transmitted House
- Senate Passed/Adopted
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor