+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 364
- Senate Date Signed by Governor
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Sent to Governor
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
- House Third Readers
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Readers
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House First Readers
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed/Adopted
- Senate Third Read
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read Second Time
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Favorably Reported
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Read and Referred
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Hopper